EP0073909 - Device for winding webs of fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stahlkontor Weser Lenze GmbH & Co. KG Hans-Lenze-Strasse 1 D-3251 Aerzen 1 / DE | [1983/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von der Heide, Roland Am Moorteich 41 D-3280 Bad Pyrmont / DE | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Thielking, Bodo, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | Thielking, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106383.1 | 15.07.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | DE19813135227 | 05.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3135227 | [1983/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073909 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073909 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/22 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
B65H18/16 (EP);
B65H2408/235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln von Warenbahnen | [1983/11] | English: | Device for winding webs of fabric | [1983/11] | French: | Dispositif pour enrouler des bandes de marchandises | [1985/30] |
Former [1983/11] | Dispositif pour enrouler des voies de marchandises | Examination procedure | 25.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/23] | 13.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1111497 [ ] (JAGENBERG WERKE AG); | DE2335930 [ ] (PERINI FABIO); | US2611552 [ ] (DANIEL NYSTRAND ERNST); | DE2522011 [ ] (HOBEMA MASCHF HERMANN); | US3161367 [ ] (GODDARD DENIS A) |