EP0071127 - Oxothienobenzoxepins, a method for their preparation and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1984 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Lawrence Leo No. 3 Box 81 Concord Road Lebanon New Jersey 08833 / US | 02 /
Setescak, Linda Louise 102 Kimberly Road Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106448.2 | 17.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | US19810285897 | 23.07.1981 Original published format: US 285897 | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071127 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, A61K31/38, // (C07D495/04, 313:00, 333:00) | [1983/06] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D333/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/06] | Title | German: | Oxothienobenzoxepine, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Medikament | [1983/06] | English: | Oxothienobenzoxepins, a method for their preparation and their use as medicaments | [1983/06] | French: | Oxothiénobenzoxépines, procédé pour leur préparation et leur application comme médicaments | [1983/06] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 23.05.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4081457 [ ] (MCFADDEN ARTHUR RAYMOND, et al); | EP0014478 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, section C, vol. 1, no. 26, March 261977 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 1103 C 76 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, section C, vol. 1, no. 131, October 281977 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 2901 C 77 |