EP0072921 - Method and equipment for the mounting of electrical terminal boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states BUNKER RAMO CORPORATION Colombia Road and Park Avenue Morris Township New Jersey / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Resch, Alois Ruppert Strasburger Strasse 7/3 D-7100 Heilbronn-Kirchhausen / DE | [1983/09] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/07] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewuerzmuehlstrasse 5 Postfach 246 D-8000 München 22 / DE | ||
Former [1983/35] | Josif, Albert, Dr.-Ing. Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/09] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewuerzmuehlstrasse 5 Postfach 246 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106460.7 | 16.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | DE19813133155 | 21.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3133155 | [1983/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072921 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072921 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04, H01R43/00 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
H01R43/205 (EP,US);
H05K13/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49153 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53174 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Bestücken von elektrischen Schaltungsplatten | [1983/09] | English: | Method and equipment for the mounting of electrical terminal boards | [1983/09] | French: | Méthode et équipement pour le montage de panneaux à bornes électriques | [1983/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 09.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.12.1986 | [1989/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2713728 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4127935 (AMMON JOHN P); | [A]US3769679 (KENDALL J) | Examination | DE7422768U |