EP0071144 - Vehicle door hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audenino, Carlo Via Roma 5 I-10028 Trofarello (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Barbero, Mario Via Ventimiglia 98 I-10126 Torino / IT | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci, Filippo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | Jacobacci, Filippo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 82106484.7 | 19.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | IT19810053491U | 28.07.1981 Original published format: IT 5349181 U | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071144 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071144 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/10 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
E05D7/10 (EP);
E05D5/128 (EP);
E05D7/1044 (EP);
E05D7/1072 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/06] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugtürscharnier | [1983/06] | English: | Vehicle door hinge | [1983/06] | French: | Charnière pour porte de véhicule | [1983/06] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 23.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/15] | DE | 21.01.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB211990 ; | [A]FR2001983 ; | [A]US2926382 ; | [A]FR2224631 ; | [A]DE149889 |