EP0073915 - Method and apparatus to control a continuous thermal process for a textile sheet-like material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. Monforts GmbH & Co Postfach 10 06 56, Schwalmstrasse 301 D-41006 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states A. Monforts GmbH & Co Postfach 10 06 56, Schwalmstrasse 301 D-41006 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pabst, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Am Engelshof 3 D-5000 Köln 40 / DE | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | von Creytz, Dietrich Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys. Tannenweg 25 D-41844 Wegberg / DE | ||
Former [1983/11] | von Creytz, Dietrich Schwalmstrasse 301 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106611.5 | 22.07.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | DE19813135473 | 08.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3135473 | DE19813148576 | 08.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3148576 | [1983/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0073915 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0073915 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073915 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0073915 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, D06B23/28, D06C7/00 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
D06B23/28 (EP,US);
G05D23/1931 (EP,US);
G05D23/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle der kontinuierlichen Wärmebehandlung einer textilen Warenbahn | [1983/11] | English: | Method and apparatus to control a continuous thermal process for a textile sheet-like material | [1983/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement thermique en continu d'une matière textile en bande | [1983/11] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 19.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.1990
22.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE H. Krantz GmbH & Co. Krantzstr. 7 D-52070 Aachen / DE | 02
19.11.1990
22.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstr. 8-10 D-71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.1990
22.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE H. Krantz GmbH & Co. Krantzstr. 7 D-52070 Aachen / DE | ||
02
19.11.1990
22.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstr. 8-10 D-71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | |||
Former [1991/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.1990
H. Krantz GmbH & Co. Krantzstr. 7 D-52070 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Bauer, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing. Am Keilbusch 4 D-52080 Aachen / DE | ||
02
19.11.1990
ADMISSIBLE Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstr. 8-10 D-71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | 24.01.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.01.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.03.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.05.1994 | Appeal received No. T0396/94 | 03.05.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.01.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 23.01.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.02.1990 | [2004/35] |
Former [1991/35] | FR | 20.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1283905 ; | [A]FR2386860 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]US3961425 (SWANSON S KEITH, et al) | [AD] - TEXTILBETRIEB, Band 99, Nr. 4, April 1981, Seite 55, W}rzburg, DE; "Ein neues System f}r kontaktlose Temperaturmessungen im Spannrahmen". |