EP0071214 - Arrangement for evaluating the braking forces of commutator traction motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/06] | Arrangement for evaluating the driving forces of a commutator machine | ||
[1986/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1987 [1987/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kölmel, Kurt, Dr. Birkenallee 142 D-8521 Bubenreuth / DE | [1983/06] | Application number, filing date | 82106685.9 | 23.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | DE19813130368 | 31.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3130368 | [1983/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071214 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071214 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60L7/08, G01R31/34 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
B60L7/08 (EP);
G01R31/343 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI [1983/06] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Ermittlung der Bremskräfte von Kommutatorfahrmotoren | [1986/44] | English: | Arrangement for evaluating the braking forces of commutator traction motors | [1986/44] | French: | Dispositif pour évaluer les forces de freinage de moteurs de traction à collecteurs | [1986/44] |
Former [1983/06] | Anordnung zur Ermittlung der Triebkräfte einer Kommutatormaschine | ||
Former [1983/06] | Arrangement for evaluating the driving forces of a commutator machine | ||
Former [1983/06] | Dispositif pour évaluer les forces motrices d'une machine à collecteurs | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 02.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1255194 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | DE2645609 [ ] (DAIDO ELEC IND) | [A] - ELEKTRISCHE BAHNEN, Band 38, Nr. 11, November 1967, Seiten 255-262, München (DE); | [A] - ELEKTRISCHE BAHNEN, Band 38, Nr. 8, August 1967, Seiten 176-179, München (DE); | Examination | - ELEKTRISCHE BAHNEN, Band 38, Nr. 11, November 1967, Seiten 255-262, München (DE); H.R. NEBELUNG et al.: "Weiterentwicklung der elektrischen Bremse bei den Lokomotiven E10/40 der Deutschen Bundesbahn". |