EP0073925 - Contact arrangement for a vacuum switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1987 [1987/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peche, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Lenther Steig 10 D-1000 Berlin 13 / DE | 02 /
Bialkowski, Günter Am Dorfanger 26 D-1000 Berlin 26 / DE | [1983/11] | Application number, filing date | 82106926.7 | 30.07.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | DE19813133799 | 26.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3133799 | [1983/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073925 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073925 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/66 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
H01H33/664 (EP,US);
H01H33/6642 (EP,US);
H01H33/6645 (EP,US);
H01H33/6646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1983/11] | Title | German: | Kontaktanordnung für Vakuumschalter | [1983/11] | English: | Contact arrangement for a vacuum switch | [1983/11] | French: | Disposition de contacts pour interrupteur à vide | [1983/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/46] | 08.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3014107 (COBINE JAMES D, et al); | [A]FR2030707 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]FR2346840 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE2638700 (SIEMENS AG); | [AD]GB2004125 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2902489 (SIEMENS AG) |