EP0072022 - Current control circuit for a power-drive controlled consumer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.10.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASR Servotron AG Avenue des Grandes-Communes 8 CH-1213 Le Petit-Lancy/Genf / CH | [1983/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petsch, Johann Anzinger Strasse 30 D-8011 Poing / DE | 02 /
Kohn, Eric F. Avenue des Grandes-Communes 8 CH-1213 Le Petit Lancy, Genf / CH | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107215.4 | 10.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | DE19813131574 | 10.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3131574 | [1983/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072022 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/28 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
H02P7/29 (EP,US);
H02P7/04 (EP,US);
H02P7/281 (EP,US);
H02P2205/01 (EP,US);
Y10S388/901 (EP,US);
Y10S388/903 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Stromregelschaltung für einen von einer Leistungstreiberstufe gesteuerten Verbraucher | [1983/07] | English: | Current control circuit for a power-drive controlled consumer | [1983/07] | French: | Circuit de régulation de courant pour un utilisateur commandé par un étage de puissance | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 13.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/34] | 29.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/50] | 19.07.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2714302 (QUERFURTH RUDOLF); | [A]DE2818800 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]FR2434511 (DBA); | [A]US4223255 (GOLDMAN GARY S, et al) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, Band 46, Nr. 5, Mai 1979, Seiten 507-512, London, G.B. | [A] - REGELUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS, Band 20, Nr. 12, Dezember 1978, Seiten 355-359, M}nchen, DE. |