EP0077892 - Word processing system having a formatting bidirectional printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daniels, Paul Richard 1001 Brushy Creek, Dr. Round Rock Texas 78664 / US | 02 /
Moore, Daniel Joseph 10605 D-K Ranch Rd. Austin Texas 78759 / US | 03 /
Nguyen, Ha Hoang 907 River Oaks Dr. Austin Texas 78753 / US | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1983/18] | Gallois, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Industrielle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 82107224.6 | 10.08.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | US19810314940 | 26.10.1981 Original published format: US 314940 | [1983/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0077892 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0077892 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077892 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/1297 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Wortverarbeitendes System mit einem formatierenden bidirektionalen Drucker | [1983/18] | English: | Word processing system having a formatting bidirectional printer | [1983/18] | French: | Système de traitement des mots à imprimante bidirectionnelle déterminant le format | [1983/18] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 07.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/13] | Request for further processing for: | 22.02.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.04.1988 | SE | 30.04.1988 | CH | 31.08.1988 | LI | 31.08.1988 | [1990/03] |
Former [1989/23] | BE | 06.04.1988 | |
SE | 30.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 06.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8102211 (CENTRONICS DATA COMPUTER [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 10, March 1981, page 4415, New York, USA; B.A. SMITH et al.: "Printer throughput enhancements". | [A] - HEWLETT PACKARD JOURNAL, vol. 29, no. 15, November 1978, pages 8-19; J.J. IGNOFFO et al.: "Managing dot-matrix printing with a microprocessor". | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 1, June 1979, pages 269-271, New York, USA; D.O. HAYS et al.: "Standard printer or I/O adapter control method and apparatus". | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 1, June 1979, pages 269-271, New York, USA D.O. HAYS et al.: "Standard printer or I/0 adapter control method and apparatus" |