EP0075101 - Method and apparatus for reducing false alarms due to interferent gases in gas warning plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1986 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerberus AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | For all designated states CERBERUS AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bukowiecki, Stanislaw, Dr.sc.nat., Chem. Schwarzbachstrasse 30 CH-8713 Uerikon / CH | 02 /
Paglotke, Karlheinz Breitwiesstrasse 31 CH-8135 Langnau am Albis / CH | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Tiemann, Ulrich c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | Tiemann, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | ||
Former [1983/13] | Grieskamp, Johannes Peter Im Baumgarten 7 CH-8123 Ebmatingen / CH | Application number, filing date | 82107283.2 | 11.08.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | CH19810006115 | 22.09.1981 Original published format: CH 611581 | [1983/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075101 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075101 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
G01N27/124 (EP,US);
G08B21/14 (EP,US);
G08B29/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reduzierung von durch Störgase hervorgerufenen Falschalarmen in Gaswarnanlagen | [1983/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for reducing false alarms due to interferent gases in gas warning plants | [1983/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la réduction de fausses alertes dues à des gaz interférents dans les installations de contrôle de gaz | [1983/13] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 05.05.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2263513 (LEVINE HARRIS [US]); | [A]FR2304080 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [AD]US4012692 (EICKER HARTMUT); | [A]GB1474080 (NOHMI BOSAI KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]FR2377035 (BRITISH STEEL CORP [GB]); | [A]DE2713622 (PREUSSAG AG FEUERSCHUTZ) |