EP0072538 - Armature coil winding apparatus for flat motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1986 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/08] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orikasa, Tetsuo 7-16, Sakuragawacho-1-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1983/08] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/08] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107307.9 | 11.08.1982 | [1983/08] | Priority number, date | JP19810126736 | 14.08.1981 Original published format: JP 12673681 | [1983/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072538 | Date: | 23.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072538 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/04 | [1983/08] | CPC: |
H02K15/0464 (EP,US);
H02K15/0471 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49011 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/08] | Title | German: | Wickelmaschine für die Ankerwicklung eines scheibenförmigen Motors | [1983/08] | English: | Armature coil winding apparatus for flat motor | [1983/08] | French: | Machine pour enrouler le bobinage d'induit d'un moteur en forme de disque | [1983/08] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 02.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3599680 (BURR ROBERT PAGE); | [AD]US3550645 (KEOGH RAYMOND J); | [A]US3955273 (MORINAGA SHIGEKI, et al) |