EP0072981 - Sheet feeding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawauchi, Masataka 3717-3, Ibaraki Ishioka-shi / JP | 02 /
Saiki, Eisaku Tsukuba-House 3-302 2625-3, Shimoinayoshi Chiyodamura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1983/09] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/32] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1983/09] | Finck, Dieter, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107335.0 | 12.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | JP19810130087 | 21.08.1981 Original published format: JP 13008781 | [1983/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072981 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072981 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0072981 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/06 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
B65H3/0669 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/09] | Title | German: | Bogenzuführeinrichtung | [1983/09] | English: | Sheet feeding device | [1983/09] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en feuilles | [1983/09] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 10.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
27.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Océ-Nederland B.V., Venlo -Patents and Information- Postbus 101 NL-5900 MA Venlo / NL | 02
29.07.1987
27.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Bühling, Gerhard Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
27.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Océ-Nederland B.V., Venlo -Patents and Information- Postbus 101 NL-5900 MA Venlo / NL | ||
02
29.07.1987
27.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | |||
Former [1993/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
27.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Océ-Nederland B.V., Venlo -Patents and Information- Postbus 101 NL-5900 MA Venlo / NL | ||
02
29.07.1987
27.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | |||
Former [1987/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
Océ-Nederland B.V., Venlo -Patents and Information- Postbus 101 NL-5900 MA Venlo / NL | ||
02
29.07.1987
Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Winter, Konrad Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Rieder & Partner Patentanwälte Sendlinger Strasse 35 D-8000 München 2 / DE | |||
Former [1987/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Océ-Nederland B.V., Venlo -Patents and Information- Postbus 101 NL-5900 MA Venlo / NL | 28.10.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.05.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05) | 21.10.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.11.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.02.1994 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.05.1990 | Appeal received No. T0440/90 | 07.06.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.04.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 28.04.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3981497 (FEINSTEIN JR PAUL, et al); | [X]CH616388 (RUENZI KURT [CH]); | [X]US4171129 (DALEY WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [A]US4212456 (RUENZI KURT [CH]); | [A]CH546690 (TURLABOR AG) | Opposition | US3949979 | US3768803 | US4174102 | JPS5546492U |