EP0072999 - Electrical machine, in particular a three-phase generator with internal cooling ducts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frister, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Wolfsgalgen 29 D-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | [1983/09] | Application number, filing date | 82107464.8 | 17.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | DE19813134080 | 28.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3134080 | [1983/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072999 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/14, H02K5/20 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
H02K1/20 (EP);
H02K5/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/09] | Title | German: | Elektrische Maschine, insbesondere Drehstromgenerator, mit innenliegenden Kühlkanälen | [1983/09] | English: | Electrical machine, in particular a three-phase generator with internal cooling ducts | [1983/09] | French: | Machine électrique, en particulier alternateur à courant triphasé, avec canaux de refroidissement placés à l'intérieur | [1983/09] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 22.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/02] | 01.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE388676 (JOHN BULKLEY WIARD); | [A]FR592372 (CONST ELECTR DE LYON ET DU DAU); | [A]FR727615 ; | [Y]FR736474 ; | [X]CH317647 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE1746614U (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]FR1167706 (MAISON BREGUET) |