EP0073986 - 3-Fluorophenyl-(di)-thiophosphoric-acid esters, process for their preparation and their use as pesticides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seufert, Walter, Dr. Bruesseler Ring 28 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Loeffler, Hans-Peter, Dr. Sinsheimer Strasse 42 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Adolphi, Heinrich, Dr. Kalmitweg 11 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1983/11] | Application number, filing date | 82107612.2 | 20.08.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | DE19813134136 | 28.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3134136 | [1983/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073986 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073986 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/18, A01N57/14 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
C07F9/18 (EP,US);
A01N57/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/11] | Title | German: | 3-Fluorphenyl-(di)thiophosphorsäureester, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zur Bekämpfung von Schädlingen | [1983/11] | English: | 3-Fluorophenyl-(di)-thiophosphoric-acid esters, process for their preparation and their use as pesticides | [1983/11] | French: | Esters d'acides fluoro-3-phenyl-(di)-thiophosphoriques, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme pesticides | [1983/11] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/11] | 08.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP7241015 ; | [Y]JP7626488 ; | [Y]GB1311773 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]EP0022954 (BASF AG [DE]); | [YP]EP0049383 (BASF AG [DE]) | [Y] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS, week T42, 12.-18. Oktober 1972, Part C: Agricultural Chemistry, Seite 4, Nr. 67874T & JP - A - 72 41015 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICAL INC.) 17-10-1972, & JP7241015 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 86, Nr. 11, 14. März 1977, Seite 156, Nr. 66868w, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 76 26488 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INC.) 06.08.1976, & JP7626488 A 00000000 |