EP0075142 - Double journal roll feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1988 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Archer, James Lee 7107 Lancashire Drive Charlotte, NC 28212 / US | 02 /
Hampson, Richard Allan 5507 Apt. N Albemarle Road Charlotte, NC 28212 / US | 03 /
Matsuda, Susumu 1327-29, Kashiya, Kannami-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Yagi, Takashi 183-97, Makinogo, Shuzenji-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107969.6 | 30.08.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | JP19810145385 | 14.09.1981 Original published format: JP 14538581 | [1983/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075142 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075142 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075142 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B41J15/20, B41J29/48, G07B5/04 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
B41J15/04 (EP,US);
B41J15/20 (EP,US);
B41J29/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/13] | B41J15/20, B41J29/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/13] | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung für einen doppellagigen Journalstreifen | [1983/13] | English: | Double journal roll feed | [1983/13] | French: | Dispositif débiteur d'une bande de papier journal à double couche | [1983/13] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 24.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1893891 (HALLIWELL JOHN J); | [YD]US2510626 (GEISHECK CHARLES W); | [A]CH134491 ; | [A]GB297512 (CARTER DAVIS LTD, et al); | [A]US2896944 (SHUHEI SHIBA); | [AD]US2998905 ; | [A]US3782666 (SANDRONE B, et al); | [A]US2991022 (WALTER WALLENS ANTHONY) | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 1, no. 5, May 1976, pages 67-68, Stamford, USA; B. JAGGER: "Paper-out sensing apparatus" |