EP0102407 - Finned tube with internal projections and method and apparatus for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/11] | Finned pipe with internal projections and method and apparatus for its manufacture | ||
[1986/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.1986 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIELAND-WERKE AG Graf-Arco-Strasse 34 89079 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states WIELAND-WERKE AG Postfach 4240, Graf-Arco-Strasse 34 D-89079 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kästner, Hans-Werner, Ing. grad. Bergstrasse 28 D-7917 Vöhringen 2 / DE | [1984/11] | Application number, filing date | 82108141.1 | 03.09.1982 | [1984/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102407 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102407 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/42, B21C37/20, B21D15/04 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
B21C37/207 (EP);
B21D15/04 (EP);
F28F1/36 (EP);
F28F1/42 (EP);
F28F1/422 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Rippenrohr mit inneren Vorsprüngen sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | [1984/11] | English: | Finned tube with internal projections and method and apparatus for its manufacture | [1986/08] | French: | Tube à ailettes avec protubérances internes et procédé et dispositif de fabrication | [1984/11] |
Former [1984/11] | Finned pipe with internal projections and method and apparatus for its manufacture | Examination procedure | 03.06.1983 | Examination requested [1984/11] | 02.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1909005 ; | [Y]US4330036 ; | [A]US2252045 ; | [A]US3232280 ; | [A]FR1553858 ; | [A]US3137926 ; | [AD]FR1562938 ; | [AD]DE679285 ; | [A]FR2185781 ; | [A]US4228852 ; | [A]DE3142223 ; | [A]FR1565632 ; | [A]EP0004983 ; | [A]DE2032891 ; | [A]GB601833 ; | [A]FR2152713 |