EP0075754 - Process for mutually fixing vehicle body elements, and body obtained by said process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1987 [1987/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capello, Franco Piazza Guala, 134 Bis I-10100 Torino / IT | 02 /
Audenino, Carlo Via Roma, 15 I-10028 Trofarello (Torino) / IT | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Bongiovanni, Guido, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Bongiovanni, Guido, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 82108234.4 | 07.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | IT19810068203 | 14.09.1981 Original published format: IT 6820381 | [1983/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075754 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075754 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B62D27/02 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
B62D27/026 (EP,US);
B62D25/06 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum gegenseitigen Befestigen von Karosserieelementen eines Fahrzeugs und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Karosserie | [1983/14] | English: | Process for mutually fixing vehicle body elements, and body obtained by said process | [1983/14] | French: | Procédé pour fixer mutuellement des éléments de carrosserie d'un véhicule et carrosserie fabriquée par un tel procédé | [1983/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 12.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE6607995U (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]); | [A]GB2028960 (FREUHAUF CORP); | [A]DE2845708 (AUDI AG); | [X]DE2854766 (AUDI AG) |