EP0074617 - Locking device for at least one dial key of a push-button telephone set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Napierski, Reinhard Talstrasse 16 D-61194 Niddatal / DE | [1983/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/12] | Representative(s) | Jochem, Bernd, et al Heinrich - Erb - Partner Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Hanauer Landstrasse 126-128 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Jochem, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem Postfach 18 02 04 60083 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1983/12] | Jochem, Bernd, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem, Postfach 17 01 45 D-60075 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108298.9 | 09.09.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | DE19813136274 | 12.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3136274 | [1983/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074617 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074617 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/66, H01H9/28 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
H04M1/667 (EP);
H01H9/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Sperren wenigstens einer Wähltaste bei Tastentelefonen | [1983/12] | English: | Locking device for at least one dial key of a push-button telephone set | [1983/12] | French: | Dispositif pour verrouiller au moins une touche d'appareils téléphoniques à clavier | [1983/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.01.1985 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7117128 ; | [A]DE2919599 (HALOUSKA FRANZ); | [A]US4236395 (AVAIUSINI MAURICIO V); | [AP]DE3043583 (BAYER JUERGEN, et al) |