EP0088155 - Ultrasonic position indicator for an isolating switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard Dorchester Ouest Montréal Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard Dorchester Ouest Montréal Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simard, Julien 8762 Riviera Brossard Québec, J4X 1C4. / CA | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Alain, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | [1983/37] | Application number, filing date | 82108365.6 | 10.09.1982 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | CA19810393193 | 24.12.1981 Original published format: CA 393193 | [1983/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088155 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088155 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088155 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/16 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
H01H9/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | Ultraschall-Positionsmelder für Trennschalter | [1983/37] | English: | Ultrasonic position indicator for an isolating switch | [1983/37] | French: | Signaleur ultrasonique de position de sectionneur | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 05.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2745952 (LEON CABANES, et al); | [A]DE2711416 (TURCK WERNER KG) |