EP0074668 - Fluidized-fluid feeding device for operating a plural-stage fluidized-bed reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergwerksverband GmbH Franz-Fischer-Weg 61 D-45307 Essen / DE | [1983/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holl, Lothar Hubertstrasse 282 D-4300 Essen 13 / DE | [1983/12] | Application number, filing date | 82108480.3 | 15.09.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | DE19813136712 | 16.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3136712 | [1983/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0074668 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0074668 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074668 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/24, // F23C11/02 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
B01J8/1818 (EP);
B01J8/1836 (EP);
F23C10/18 (EP);
B01J2208/00141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/12] | Title | German: | Aufgabeeinrichtung für Wirbelfluid zum Betreiben eines mehrstufigen Wirbelschichtreaktors | [1983/12] | English: | Fluidized-fluid feeding device for operating a plural-stage fluidized-bed reactor | [1983/12] | French: | Dispositif d'introduction de gaz de fluidification pour faire opérer un réacteur à lit fluidifié comprenant plusieurs étages | [1983/12] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 27.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3001931 (OSBORNE JOHN B); | [A]GB1536846 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO); | [A]EP0012857 (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH [DE]); | [E]GB2094171 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) |