EP0075280 - Clamping screw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.07.1989 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1989 | Opposition rejected | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Hermann Im Vogelskorb 1 D-6803 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | 02 /
Muders, Erwin, Ing. (grad.) Rohrbacher Strasse 47 D-6906 Leimen / DE | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Fritsch, Klaus, et al c/o BBC Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Zentralbereich Patente Postfach 10 03 51 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Fritsch, Klaus, et al c/o BBC Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Zentralbereich Patente Postfach 10 03 51 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1983/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108544.6 | 16.09.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | DE19813137117 | 18.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3137117 | [1983/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075280 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075280 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075280 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/30 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
H01R4/34 (EP);
H01R4/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/13] | Title | German: | Schraubklemme | [1983/13] | English: | Clamping screw | [1983/13] | French: | Borne à vis | [1983/13] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 11.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1987
24.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE Christian Geyer GmbH + Co. Nimrodstrasse 10-18 D-90441 Nürnberg 70 / DE | [1988/05] | 26.05.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.07.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.03.1989 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.03.1989 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1935560U (GEORG SCHLEGEL ELEKTROTECHNISC [DE]); | [X]BE878964 (VYNCKIER N V) |