EP0076452 - Cephalosporin derivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scartazzini, Riccardo, Dr. Conrad Ferdinand Meyer-Strasse 38 CH-4059 Basel / CH | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Zumstein & Klingseisen, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/15] | Zumstein, Fritz sen., Dr. Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108930.7 | 27.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | CH19810006303 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: CH 630381 | CH19820003049 | 17.05.1982 Original published format: CH 304982 | CH19820004807 | 11.08.1982 Original published format: CH 480782 | [1983/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0076452 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0076452 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/20, A61K31/535, // C07D263/48 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP);
C07D263/48 (EP);
C07D309/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Cephalosporinverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Präparate | [1983/15] | English: | Cephalosporin derivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1983/15] | French: | Dérivés de céphalosporine, procédé pour leur préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1983/15] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 27.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 01.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/41] | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR7475M ; | [A]FR2068419 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]FR2137899 (GLAXO LAB LTD); | [A]FR2313069 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [E]US4379787 (LUNN WILLIAM H W, et al); | [E]US4382931 (LUNN WILLIAM H W, et al); | [E]US4382932 (LUNN WILLIAM H W, et al); | [E]US4388316 (LUNN WILLIAM H W, et al); | [E]EP0096297 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [E]US4430499 (WHEELER WILLIAM J [US]) |