EP0075952 - Hydrogenolysis process for the production of monoethylene glycol monomethyl ether, monoethylene glycol and ethanol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.07.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartley, William J. 500 Sheridan Circle Charleston 25314 West Virginia / US | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Wuesthoff, Franz, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Wuesthoff, Franz, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109021.4 | 29.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | US19810307225 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: US 307225 | [1983/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075952 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/10, C07C29/60, C07C43/13, C07C41/18, C07C31/20, C07C31/08 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
C07C29/10 (EP);
C07C27/00 (KR);
C07C29/00 (EP);
C07C29/60 (EP);
C07C41/26 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/00, C07C31/202 (EP);
C07C29/10, C07C31/202 (EP);
C07C29/60, C07C31/08 (EP);
C07C41/26, C07C43/13 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Hydrogenolisierungsverfahren zur Herstellung von Monomethyläther des Monoäthylenglykols, Monoäthylenglykol und Äthanol | [1983/14] | English: | Hydrogenolysis process for the production of monoethylene glycol monomethyl ether, monoethylene glycol and ethanol | [1983/14] | French: | Procédé d'hydrogénolyse pour la production de monométhyl éther de monoéthylène glycol, monoéthylèneglycol et éthanol | [1983/14] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/29] | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/39] | 13.04.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP7425246 ; | [A]DE417926 (MERCK AG E); | [A]DE898894 (BASF AG); | [AD]DE2900279 (HOECHST AG) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.83, no.1, July 7, 1975, page 762, abstract no.9186m, Columbus, Ohio (US) & JP - A - 74 25 246 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INC.) (June 28, 1974), & JP7425246 A 00000000 |