EP0075958 - Curable molding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 24.05.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1989 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gardner, Hugh Chester 1273 Millstone River Road Somerset New Jersey / US | [1986/46] |
Former [1983/14] | 01 /
Gardner, Hugh Chester 1273 Millstone River Road Somerville Somerset New Jersey / US | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/14] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109028.9 | 29.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | US19810307214 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: US 307214 | [1983/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075958 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075958 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075958 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/28 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
C08F222/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Vernetzbare Formmassezusammensetzungen | [1983/14] | English: | Curable molding compositions | [1983/14] | French: | Compositions de moulage réticulables | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 19.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.1987
27.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.1987
27.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 29.10.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.06.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.06.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 20.02.1989 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1989/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3373075 (FRANK FEKETE, et al); | [X]EP0019149 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |