EP0105051 - Pet food products containing alpha-amylase and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/15] | Food products containing alpha-amylase and process | ||
[1989/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Quaker Oats Company 617 West Main Street Barrington Illinois 60010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | For all designated states THE QUAKER OATS COMPANY 617 West Main Street Barrington Illinois 60010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preignitz, Ronald D. 1469 Lowe Drive Algonquin Illinois 60102 / US | [1984/15] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109063.6 | 30.09.1982 | [1984/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105051 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105051 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/10, A23L1/20, A23K1/165, A23K1/18 | [1984/15] | CPC: |
A23K20/189 (EP,US);
A23K40/25 (EP,US);
A23K50/45 (EP);
A23L7/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/15] | Title | German: | Alpha-amylase enthaltendes Haustierfutter und Verfahren | [1989/12] | English: | Pet food products containing alpha-amylase and process | [1989/12] | French: | Produit alimentaire pour des animaux domestiques contenant l'alpha-amylase et procédé | [1989/12] |
Former [1984/15] | Alpha-amylase enthaltendes Nahrungsmittelprodukt und Verfahren | ||
Former [1984/15] | Food products containing alpha-amylase and process | ||
Former [1984/15] | Produit alimentaire contenant l'alpha-amylase et procédé | Examination procedure | 27.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 10.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3202514 (BURGESS HOVEY M, et al); | [A]BE754258 (MONSANTO CO); | [X]DE2127831 ; | [A]DE2254924 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC); | [A]GB1495118 (QUAKER OATS CO); | [A]DE2726109 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH) |