EP0076499 - Spectacles, in particular safety goggles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1986 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondermann GmbH. 1, Diekerstrasse D-5657 Haan / DE | [1983/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoebink, Paul 25, Hacketäuer Strasse D-5650 Solingen / DE | 02 /
Laibach, Friedrich 48, Böttinger Strasse D-5657 Haan / DE | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Tackenberg, Karl H. Birkenweiher 15 D-5650 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Tackenberg, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenweiher 15 D-5650 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109115.4 | 02.10.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | DE19813139555 | 05.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3139555 | [1983/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0076499 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0076499 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076499 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G02C1/08, G02C5/14 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
G02C5/146 (EP);
A61F9/027 (EP);
G02C11/12 (EP);
G02C5/2263 (EP);
G02C7/16 (EP);
G02C9/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1983/15] | Title | German: | Brille, insbesondere Schutzbrille | [1983/15] | English: | Spectacles, in particular safety goggles | [1983/15] | French: | Lunettes, en particulier lunettes protectrices | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1499503 ; | [A]DE1285767 ; | [A]DE2003450 ; | [A]DE1925231 |