EP0081054 - Azabicyclo alkyl derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hadley, Michael Stewart 9 Coney Gree Sawbridgeworth Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
King, Francis David 67 Cherry Garden Lane Newport Essex / GB | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Stott, Michael John, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | Stott, Michael John, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82109116.2 | 20.12.1979 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | GB19500038078 | 30.12.1978 Original published format: GB 5038078 | GB19790009262 | 15.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7909262 | GB19790027831 | 09.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7927831 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081054 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081054 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081054 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D451/04, C07D451/02, C07D451/14, C07D487/08, // (C07D487/08, 209:00, 209:00),(C07D487/08, 223:00, 209:00) | [1983/24] | CPC: |
C07D451/02 (EP,US);
C07D451/04 (EP,US);
C07D451/14 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/24] | Title | German: | Azabicyclo-Alkyl-Derivate | [1983/24] | English: | Azabicyclo alkyl derivatives | [1983/24] | French: | Dérivés azabicyclo alkylés | [1983/24] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/24] | 09.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP79302978.6 / EP0013138 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.1986 | [1989/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB774858 (SANDOZ LTD); | [A]DE2748260 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [XE]FR2446823 (DELALANDE SA) | [A] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, vol. 111, no. 5, 1978, Verlag Chemie GmbH, WEINHEIM (DE); H.F. GRUTZMACHER et al.: "Untersuchungen zur Synchronen oder zweik}l-Ionen von 3-substituierten Tropanen", pages 1962-77 |