EP0077933 - Eddy currents transmitting arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Dr. Friedrich Förster Prüfgerätebau GmbH & Co. KG In Laisen 70 72766 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states Institut Dr. Friedrich Förster Prüfgerätebau GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 925 In Laisen 70 D-72766 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reitz, Helmut Sonnentalstrasse 31 D-7430 Metzingen / DE | [1983/18] | Application number, filing date | 82109118.8 | 02.10.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | DE19813142459 | 27.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3142459 | [1983/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0077933 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0077933 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077933 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/90 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
G01N27/9006 (EP);
G01N27/904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1983/18] | Title | German: | Wirbelstromgeberanordnung | [1983/18] | English: | Eddy currents transmitting arrangement | [1983/18] | French: | Dispositif transmetteur de courants de Foucault | [1983/18] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/46] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2838388 ; | [A]US3900793 ; | [A]US2878447 | Examination | - Firmenprospekt, Institut Dr. Förster, DEFECTOTEST.Geber-Systeme M 2.850/2.851/2.852 und H 2.859/2.860/2.861, 6/1977 |