EP0077486 - A method of reflecting high-frequency microwaves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.1983 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/17] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebneth, Harold, Dr. Berta-von-Suttner-Strasse 61 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Fitzky, Hans Georg, Dr. Kolpingstrasse 7 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Giesecke, Henning, Dr. Duesseldorfer Strasse 49 D-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | 04 /
Wolf, Gerhard Dieter, Dr. Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 29 D-4047 Dormagen 5 / DE | [1983/17] | Application number, filing date | 82109136.0 | 04.10.1982 | [1983/17] | Priority number, date | DE19813141118 | 16.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3141118 | [1983/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077486 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/14, D01F9/12 | [1983/17] | CPC: |
D01F11/127 (EP);
H01Q15/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reflexion hochfrequenter Mikrowellen | [1983/17] | English: | A method of reflecting high-frequency microwaves | [1983/17] | French: | Procédé de réflexion de micro-ondes à haute fréquence | [1983/17] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 06.05.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2015652 [ ]; | EP0010711 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | DE2818523 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES) |