|
08.02.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.10.1990 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.07.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.1990 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.04.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.02.1990 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1989 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
19.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1989 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
06.03.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1988 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1987 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.01.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.02.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1985 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.1985 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1985 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
29.06.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.04.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.1985 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1984 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1984 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.1983 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1983 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
05.01.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |