EP0077029 - Renin inhibitory peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veber, Daniel F. 290 Batleson Road Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 02 /
Rich, Daniel H. 2817 Mason Street Madison Wisconsin 53705 / US | [1983/16] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109272.3 | 07.10.1982 | [1983/16] | Priority number, date | US19810309854 | 08.10.1981 Original published format: US 309854 | [1983/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0077029 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0077029 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077029 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/10, A61K37/02, A61K37/64 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
C07K5/0227 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
Y10S530/86 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/11] | C07C103/52, A61K37/02, A61K37/64 | ||
Former IPC [1983/16] | C07C103/52, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/16] | Title | German: | Peptidische Renininhibitoren | [1983/16] | English: | Renin inhibitory peptides | [1983/16] | French: | Peptides ayant une activité inhibitrice contre la rennine | [1983/16] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 26.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2262532 (SANRAKU OCEAN CO [JP]); | [A]FR2399409 (ANVAR [FR]) | [A] - Chemical Abstracts vol. 92, 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA D.H. RICH et al. "Synthesis of analogs of the carboxyl protease inhibitor pepstatin. Effect of structure on inhibition of pepsin and renin", page 102, column 2, abstract no. 52413f |