EP0078939 - Bar-like device for detecting the respective level of fluids in containers, channels or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henning, Wolfram Neumarkter Strasse D-8501 Allersberg / DE | [1983/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Bibrach Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Rehberg Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109571.8 | 16.10.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | DE19813144541 | 10.11.1981 Original published format: DE 3144541 | [1983/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078939 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078939 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/28 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
G01F23/292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/20] | Title | German: | Stabähnliche Vorrichtung zum Erfassen des jeweiligen Niveaus von Flüssigkeiten in Behältern, Kanälen o. dgl. | [1983/20] | English: | Bar-like device for detecting the respective level of fluids in containers, channels or the like | [1983/20] | French: | Dispositif en forme de bâton pour détecter le niveau respectif de liquides dans des récipients, des canaux ou similaires | [1983/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 17.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.08.1986 | IT | 27.08.1986 | SE | 31.08.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.08.1986 | |
SE | 31.08.1986 | ||
Former [1989/16] | SE | 31.08.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | US3448616 [ ] (WOSTL WOLFGANG J, et al); | DE1548983 [ ] (HACTRONIC AG); | DE2654104 [ ] (GRUMMAN AEROSPACE CORP); | EP0006317 [ ] (EATON SA MONACO [MC]); | DE2845565 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | DE2804639 [ ] |