EP0078014 - Speech recognition system for an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1987 [1987/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noso, Kazunori 68, Oppamahigashi-cho 3-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kishi, Norimasa 150-4, Hitorizawa-cho Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Futami, Toru 68, Oppamahigashi-cho 3-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109697.1 | 20.10.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | JP19810169176 | 22.10.1981 Original published format: JP 16917681 | [1983/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078014 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078014 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G10L7/08, B60Q1/00 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
B60R16/0373 (EP,US);
G10L15/20 (EP,US);
G10L25/87 (EP,US);
G10L2015/228 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/18] | G10L1/04, B60Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/18] | Title | German: | Spracherkennungseinrichtung für Fahrzeuge | [1983/18] | English: | Speech recognition system for an automotive vehicle | [1983/18] | French: | Dispositif de reconnaissance vocal pour véhicule automobile | [1983/18] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 10.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4100370 (SUZUKI MATSUMI, et al); | [A]US4158750 (SAKOE HIROAKI, et al); | [A]GB2056732 (NISSAN MOTOR) |