EP0108155 - Step ladder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helm, geb. Neundörfer, Cäcilia Arndtstrasse 8 D-6143 Lorsch / DE | [1984/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hechler, Peter Weberner Strasse 5 D-6101 Modautal 2 / DE | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1984/49] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/20] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110080.7 | 02.11.1982 | [1984/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108155 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108155 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E06C1/20, E06C1/38 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
E06C1/393 (EP);
E06C1/20 (EP);
E06C1/38 (EP);
E06C7/423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Stehleiter | [1984/20] | English: | Step ladder | [1984/20] | French: | Echelle pliante | [1984/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 03.09.1985 | Date of receipt | 04.10.1985 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.1983 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   31.12.1983 | 02.11.1983 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   31.12.1983 | 02.11.1983 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   31.12.1983 | 02.11.1983 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   31.12.1983 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.1985 | 02.12.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.1986 | 01.12.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.11.1986 | FR | 12.11.1986 | IT | 12.11.1986 | NL | 12.11.1986 | SE | 30.11.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.11.1986 | |
IT | 12.11.1986 | ||
NL | 12.11.1986 | ||
SE | 30.11.1986 | ||
Former [1989/16] | BE | 12.11.1986 | |
NL | 12.11.1986 | ||
SE | 30.11.1986 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 12.11.1986 | |
NL | 12.11.1986 | ||
Former [1988/38] | NL | 12.11.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH90932 (BRUNNER LINO [CH]); | [A]US1942849 (THRASHER NED L); | [A]US2718346 (MAX GALEN); | [A]EP0039078 (KLENK ADAM) |