EP0078545 - Imidazolecarboxylic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/19] | Novel imidazolecarboxylic acid derivatives | ||
[1988/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnettler, Richard A. 9874 Forest Glen Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
Dage, Richard C. 7825 Shadowhill Way Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
Grisar, J. Martin 9, rue Bain Finkwiller F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit 34 21040 Gerenzano (VA) / IT | [2010/01] |
Former [1986/39] | Sgarbi, Renato Gruppo Lepetit S.p.A. Patent & Trademark Department 34, Via Roberto Lepetit I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1984/29] | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit, 34 I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1983/19] | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit, 34 I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | Application number, filing date | 82110156.5 | 04.11.1982 | [1983/19] | Priority number, date | US19810317956 | 04.11.1981 Original published format: US 317956 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078545 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078545 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/90, A61K31/415 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
C07D233/90 (EP,US);
C07D233/70 (KR);
A61P25/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/19] | Title | German: | Imidazolkarbonsäure Derivate | [1983/19] | English: | Imidazolecarboxylic acid derivatives | [1988/05] | French: | Dérivés d'acide imidazolecarboxylique | [1983/19] |
Former [1983/19] | Novel imidazolecarboxylic acid derivatives | Examination procedure | 14.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/51] | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2468324 (ROBERT DUSCHINSKY); | [A]FR1184709 (CFMC); | [A]FR1367746 (GEIGY AG J R); | [X]US3303199 (DOEBEL KARL J, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 7, 19th August 1974, page 385, col. 1, no. 37509w, Columbus Ohio (USA); | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 7, 19th August 1974, page 385, col. 1, no. 37509w, Columbus Ohio (USA); T. TAGUCHI et al.: "Convenient method for the synthesis of 2(1H)-imidazolone derivatives" |