EP0079053 - Reel drive system of magnetic recording and reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1988 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Masashi 41-5, Yanagigaoka Nakaminato-shi / JP | 02 /
Katohno, Noboru 7-27-504, Wakamiya-1-chome Mito-shi / JP | 03 /
Yokota, Hajime 1808-14, Higashiishikawa Katsuta-shi / JP | 04 /
Okayama, Masao 2625-3-8-301, Shimoinayoshi Chiyodamura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/20] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110164.9 | 04.11.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | JP19810177159 | 06.11.1981 Original published format: JP 17715981 | JP19810185370 | 20.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18537081 | [1983/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0079053 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0079053 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079053 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/44, G11B15/66 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
G11B15/44 (EP,US);
B29D35/0018 (KR);
A43B23/0245 (KR);
B29C45/00 (KR);
G11B15/665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/20] | Title | German: | Spulenantriebssystem für ein magnetisches Aufnahme- und Wiedergabegerät | [1983/20] | English: | Reel drive system of magnetic recording and reproducing apparatus | [1983/20] | French: | Système d'entraînement de bobine pour un appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction magnétique | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 21.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3529787 (BOWMAN RONALD JAMES, et al); | [A]US3784761 (MORITAN N, et al); | [A]US3912205 (KOYAMA TSUNEYUKI); | [A]FR2284947 (BELTEK CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2298855 (INCIS SNC SEREGNI RENATO E MAR [IT]); | [A]US3979772 (UMEDA HIROYUKI); | [A]BE859810 (STAAR SA); | [X]US4173320 (SCHATTEMAN ETIENNE A M [BE]); | [A]FR2475775 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0057921 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |