EP0080144 - Process for fleece strengthening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Tadashi 1391-1, Komahane Sohwa-cho Sashima-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Weissenfeld-Richters, Helga Höhnerweg 2 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Weissenfeld-Richters, Helga, Dr. Höhnerweg 2 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110535.0 | 15.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | JP19810187495 | 20.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18749581 | [1983/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0080144 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080144 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/62 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
D04H1/62 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1041 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1043 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2762 (EP,US);
Y10T442/277 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verfestigung eines Vlieses | [1983/22] | English: | Process for fleece strengthening | [1983/22] | French: | Procédé de consolidation d'une nappe | [1983/22] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 24.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1539810 (HARMON C, et al) |