EP0080150 - Conveyor arrangement for heavy cylindrical articles in workshops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1986 [1986/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LES CABLES DE LYON Société anonyme dite: 170 quai de Clichy F-92111 Clichy Cedex / FR | [1983/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemaitre, René 6, rue Maurice Ravel F-92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110571.5 | 16.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | FR19810021738 | 20.11.1981 Original published format: FR 8121738 | [1983/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0080150 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080150 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/24, B61B13/04, B65G7/02 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
B21C47/24 (EP,US);
B65H67/06 (EP,US);
Y10S414/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/22] | Title | German: | Förderanlage in Werkstätten für schwere zylindrische Gegenstände | [1983/22] | English: | Conveyor arrangement for heavy cylindrical articles in workshops | [1983/22] | French: | Dispositif de transport en atelier d'objets cylindriques lourds | [1983/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2241475 (VOEST AG [AT]); | [A]FR2297176 (ELINEAU HUBERT [FR]) |