EP0079620 - Aluminum-coated steel sheets for enameling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusanagi, Yoshihiro 13-22 Imakitaikegami-cho Amagasaki Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuchida, Jiro 6-43 Shinyasumatsu 3-chome Izumisano Osaka-fu / JP | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Groening, Hans Wilhelm Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110628.3 | 16.11.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | JP19810184644 | 17.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18464481 | [1983/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0079620 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0079620 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, C23F17/00 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
C23C2/26 (EP,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,US);
B32B15/012 (EP);
C23C2/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/21] | Title | German: | Aluminiumbeschichtete Stahlbleche zum Emaillieren | [1983/21] | English: | Aluminum-coated steel sheets for enameling | [1983/21] | French: | Feuilles d'acier revêtues d'aluminium pour l'émaillage | [1983/21] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 06.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/45] | 02.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54120258 ; | [A]JP56005964 ; | [A]JP53144922 ; | [Y]DE1007595 (SCHMIDT GMBH KARL); | [A]FR1507123 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP); | [A]FR2030416 (ARMCO STEEL CORP [US]); | [X]US3705023 (FISTER JULIUS C JR); | [A]US3881882 (HUGHES IAN F, et al) | [Y] - PRAKT. METALLOGR. SONDERB. 1977, 7, (Metallogr. Oberflächenveredelte Stähle, Schweiss- Lotverbind.), pages 45-56, DE; G. LANGENSCHEID: "Der Einfluss des Stickstoffgehaltes tauchaluminierter Stahlbleche auf das Wachstum der Verbindungsschicht Fe2 Al5"& CHEM. ABSTR., vol. 90, no. 4, 1979, page 226, no | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 14, April 1980, page 237, no. 114637t, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 54 120 258 (FURAKUWA ALUMINUM CO., LTD.) 18-09-1979, & JP54120258 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 12, March 1979, page 194, no. 90708x, Columbus, Ohio, USA; G.U. SCHLOSSER et al.: "Aluminum hot-dipped steel band - immersion conditons, coating buildup, and transformation behavior" & FREIBERG. FORSCHUNGSH. B 1978, B201, 5-59 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 18, May 1981, page 256, no. 143668a, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 56 005964 (NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD.) 22-01-1981, & JP56005964 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 20, May 1979, page 199, no. 155475r, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 53 144 922 (NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD.) 16-12-1978, & JP53144922 A 00000000 |