EP0080167 - Apparatus for manufacturing woven slide fastener stringers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/22] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing woven slide fastener stringers and articles produced thereby | ||
[1988/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ofusa, Masaatsu 4018, Mikkaichi Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/22] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110646.5 | 18.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | JP19810185658 | 19.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18565881 | JP19810197188U | 29.12.1981 Original published format: JP 19718881 U | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080167 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080167 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080167 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/54, A44B19/40 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
A44B19/406 (EP,US);
A44B19/54 (EP,US);
D03D1/00 (EP,US);
D10B2501/0631 (EP,US);
Y10T24/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1983/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von gewebten Reissverschlussträgerbändern | [1988/05] | English: | Apparatus for manufacturing woven slide fastener stringers | [1988/05] | French: | Appareil pour la fabrication de rubans de bande tissés de fermetures à glissière | [1988/05] |
Former [1983/22] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von gewebten Reissverschlussträgerbändern und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Artikel | ||
Former [1983/22] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing woven slide fastener stringers and articles produced thereby | ||
Former [1983/22] | Méthode et appareil pour la fabrication de rubans de bande tissés de fermetures à glissière et articles ainsi obtenus | Examination procedure | 10.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3692068 (AUER ULRICH W, et al); | [XD]DE2221855 (REMACO ETS [IT]); | [X]GB2072717 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK); | [X]DE1167578 (PLATE & SUTER); | [X]DE2707357 (OPTI PATENT FORSCHUNG FAB); | [A]US3961652 (HASUDA MINORU, et al); | [A]FR2423999 (HEILMANN OPTILON [CH]) |