EP0082961 - Random access memory array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1989 [1989/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knepper, Ronald William Andrews Road Box 352 Lagrangeville New York 12540 / US | [1983/27] | Representative(s) | Gaugel, Heinz Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | Gaugel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110933.7 | 26.11.1982 | [1983/27] | Priority number, date | US19810336004 | 30.12.1981 Original published format: US 336004 | [1983/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0082961 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0082961 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082961 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/40 | [1983/27] | CPC: |
G11C11/416 (EP,US);
G11C11/4113 (EP,US);
G11C11/415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/27] | Title | German: | Direktzugriffspeichermatrix | [1983/27] | English: | Random access memory array | [1983/27] | French: | Réseau de mémoire à accès aléatoire | [1983/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 10.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3736574 (GERSBACH J) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 8B, January 1980, pages 3711-3713, New York, US; H.D. VARADARAJAN: "Low-powr bipolar random-access memory array" | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 15th February 1979, pages 102-103, IEEE, New York, US; U. BUERKER et al.: "Static RAMs. An ECL 100K compatible 1024x4b RAM with 15ns access time" | [A] - IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, vol. 25, no. 2 and 3, May 1981, pages 126-134, Armonk, N.Y., US; J.A. DORLER et al.: "A 1024-byte ECL random ccess memory using a complementary transistor switch (CTS) cell" |