EP0081198 - Chroma signal recording and reproducing circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1988 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Akira 857-11, Tsuda Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Komatsu, Keiichi Yorii-Apartment House 433 391-2, Tabiko Katsuta-shi / JP | 03 /
Kuroyanagi, Tomomitsu 391-2, Tabiko Katsuta-shi / JP | 04 /
Kojima, Noboru Totsukaryo, 1745, Totsukacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/24] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111130.9 | 02.12.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | JP19810195687 | 07.12.1981 Original published format: JP 19568781 | JP19820022703 | 17.02.1982 Original published format: JP 2270382 | JP19820081402 | 17.05.1982 Original published format: JP 8140282 | JP19820150763 | 01.09.1982 Original published format: JP 15076382 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081198 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081198 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081198 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/82 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
H04N5/923 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/84 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/7933 (EP,US);
H04N9/7936 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/83 (EP,US);
H04N9/898 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/24] | H04N9/497 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/24] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabeschaltung für ein Chrominanzsignal | [1983/24] | English: | Chroma signal recording and reproducing circuit | [1983/24] | French: | Circuit d'enregistrement et de reproduction pour un signal de chrominance | [1983/24] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56069984 ; | [X]FR2419632 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [X]US4220964 (NUMAKURA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US4240105 (FAROUDJA YVES C [US]); | [A]US4068257 (HIROTA AKIRA, et al); | [A]US4193084 (NUMAKURA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 133(E-71)(805), 25th August 1981 & JP-A-56 069 984 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 11-06-1981, & JP56069984 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. CE-24, no. 3, August 1978, pages 458-466, New York, USA; A. SHIBATA et al.: "Advanced and simplified signal processing system for VTR and its high performance LSI's". |