EP0111013 - Glycol compositions containing phosphorous-modified silane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jernigan, Robert Thorne 103 Ash Lane Lake Jackson State of Texas 77566 / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111209.1 | 03.12.1982 | [1984/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111013 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111013 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/00 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
C09K5/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/25] | Title | German: | Glykol-Zusammensetzungen die ein phosphormodifiziertes Silan enthalten | [1984/25] | English: | Glycol compositions containing phosphorous-modified silane | [1984/25] | French: | Compositions de glycol contenant un silane modifié par du phosphore | [1984/25] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/37] | 14.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0029728 ; | [AD]US4333843 ; | [AD]GB2018266 |