EP0109981 - Fail-safe data processing equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.04.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | For:FR
GB
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eibach, Wolfgang Eberhardstrasse 38 D-7031 Holzgerlingen / DE | 02 /
Roehr, Kuno Manfred, Dr. Reiherweg 12 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | 03 /
Schulz, Klaus M., Dr. Kirschhalde 19 D-7031 Aidlingen / DE | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Jost, Ottokarl IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1984/24] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111312.3 | 07.12.1982 | [1984/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109981 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109981 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
G06F11/2025 (EP,US);
G06F11/2038 (EP,US);
G06F11/2041 (EP,US);
G06F15/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/24] | Title | German: | Ausfallgesicherte Datenverarbeitungsanlage | [1984/24] | English: | Fail-safe data processing equipment | [1984/24] | French: | Installation de traitement de données à l'abri de défaillance | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Additional claims {1} | 02.02.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Additional claims | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
05.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt PTL D-60591 Frankfurt / DE Opponents representative Lertes, Kurt AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | 02
16.03.1988
07.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
05.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt PTL D-60591 Frankfurt / DE Opponents representative Lertes, Kurt, Dr. AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02
16.03.1988
07.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1988/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
05.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt PTL D-60591 Frankfurt / DE Opponents representative Lertes, Kurt, Dr. AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02
16.03.1988
07.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1988/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
05.05.1988
ADMISSIBLE AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt PTL D-60591 Frankfurt / DE Opponents representative Lertes, Kurt, Dr. AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | 11.05.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.02.1994 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.01.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.12.1993 | FR | 31.08.1994 | DE | 01.09.1994 | [1995/24] |
Former [1995/03] | GB | 07.12.1993 | |
DE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 07.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3641505 (ARTZ WALTER M, et al); | [A]US3818199 (RABOLD J, et al); | [A]US3864670 (INOUE TADANARI, et al); | [A]US3964056 (CHARPENTIER JEAN, et al); | [A]DE2460259 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]DE2727983 (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH); | [A]US4208715 (ISHII TAKATOSHI [JP], et al) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 17, Nr. 3, August 1974, Seite 746, New York, USA | Examination | DE2319456 | US3636331 | DE2205914 | DE2321260 | - Elektrizitätswirtschaft 81 (1982), 22, Seiten 751-755. | - Elektrizitätswirtschaft 81 (1982), 22, Seiten 756-760. | - Elektrizitätswirtschaft 81 (1982), 22, Seiten 761-764. | - Sonderdruck aus Elektrizitätswirtschaft 80 (1981) 3, Seiten 73-89. | - etz-a Band 99 (1978), Heft 5, Seiten 260-266. | - Signal + Draht, 66 (1974) 3, Seiten 40-45. | - etz-a Band 99 (1978), Heft 7, Seiten 421-427. | - Lexikon der Elektrotechnik von O. Neufang, 1983, Seite 445, Verlag Friedrich Vieweg & Sohn, Braunschweig/Wiesbaden. |