EP0084115 - Hydrothermal crystal growing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1988 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chai, Bruce Huai-Tzu 9 Stella Drive Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
Buehler, Ernest 42 Mountain Way Chatham New Jersey 07928 / US | 03 /
Flynn, John James 3 Old Farm House Road Millington New Jersey 07946 / US | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Haigh, Charles Roy, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | Haigh, Charles Roy, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1983/30] | Kemp, John Arthur 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82111337.0 | 07.12.1982 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | US19820337231 | 06.01.1982 Original published format: US 337231 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084115 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084115 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084115 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C30B7/10, C30B29/14 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C30B7/00 (EP,US);
C01B25/36 (EP,US);
C30B29/14 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1024 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur hydrothermalen Kristallzüchtung | [1983/30] | English: | Hydrothermal crystal growing process | [1983/30] | French: | Procédé pour la croissance hydrothermale de cristaux | [1983/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.05.1987 | BE | 20.05.1987 | CH | 20.05.1987 | IT | 20.05.1987 | LI | 20.05.1987 | SE | 31.05.1987 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/24] | AT | 20.05.1987 | |
BE | 20.05.1987 | ||
CH | 20.05.1987 | ||
LI | 20.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
Former [1989/18] | AT | 20.05.1987 | |
BE | 20.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 20.05.1987 | |
BE | 20.05.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 20.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4247358 (AUCOIN THOMAS R, et al); | [A]US4324773 (CHAI BRUCE H, et al); | [XP]EP0057773 (ALLIED CORP [US]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 43, no. 3, April 1978, pages 313-319, North-Holland Publishing Company; E.D. KOLB et al.: "Hydrothermal synthesis of aluminum orthophosphate" | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 50, no. 2, October 1980, pages 404-418, North-Holland Publishing Company; E.D. KOLB et al.: "Solubility, crystal growth and perfection of aluminum orthophosphate" | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 6, 9th February 1981, page 616, no. 39631x, Columbus, Ohio, US; L.E. DRAFALL et al.: "The growth of berlinite (AIPO4) single crystals" & GOV. REP. ANNOUNCE. INDEX (U.S.) 1980, 80 (22), 4847 |