EP0082422 - Circuit for a power FET transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almeder, Ernst Mayerweckstrasse 6 A-1210 Wien / AT | 02 /
Cyba, Edward Michael Czerningasse 16/3/13 A-1020 Wien / AT | 03 /
Ramlohr, Franz Heckenweg 7 A-1222 Wien / AT | [1983/26] | Application number, filing date | 82111404.8 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | AT19810005530 | 23.12.1981 Original published format: AT 553081 | [1983/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082422 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/687 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
H03K17/687 (EP);
H03K17/6871 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1983/26] | Title | German: | Beschaltung für einen Leistungs-Feldeffekttransistor | [1983/26] | English: | Circuit for a power FET transistor | [1983/26] | French: | Circuit pour un transistor de puissance de type FET | [1983/26] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/42] | 11.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2032719 ; | [A]DE2914909 ; | [A]GB2061571 | [Y] - EDN, Band 26, Nr. 1, Mai 1981 Boston, USA S. CLEMENTE et al. "Careful gate-driver design upspower-MOSFET performance" Seiten 177-182 | [A] - ELEKTRONIK, Band 29, Nr. 8, April 1980, München J. KRAUSSE et al. "Mikrocomputer- und LSI-kompat ible Leistungsschalter" Seiten 61-64 | [AP] - ELEKTRONIK, Nr. 11, Juni 1982 B. PELLY "Die Gateladung von Leistungs-MOSFETs" Seiten 91-94 |