EP0093200 - A method for recording data on a magnetic recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaassen, Klaas B. 20 Spinel NL-2691 TM 's-Gravenzande / NL | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82111445.1 | 10.12.1982 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | US19820373203 | 29.04.1982 Original published format: US 373203 | [1983/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093200 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093200 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093200 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/09, G11B5/58, G11B5/03 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
G11B5/5965 (EP);
G11B5/02 (EP);
G11B5/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/45] | G11B5/09, G11B5/58, G11B5/47 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Datenaufzeichnung auf einen magnetischen Träger | [1983/45] | English: | A method for recording data on a magnetic recording medium | [1983/45] | French: | Méthode pour enregistrer des données sur un support magnétique | [1983/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0030256 ; | [Y]US3187111 ; | [Y]US1886616 ; | [Y]US3956769 ; | [AP]EP0064099 | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, vol. MAG-8, no. 3, September 1972, pages 539-541, New York, US; L.W. BROWNLOW et al.: "Write field analysis for integrated heads of the finite pole-tip configuration" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 4, September 1981, pages 1910-1911, New York, US; M.A. CHURCH et al.: "Thin film head assembly with side-by-side elements" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 9, February 1981, pages 4314-4316, New York, US; K.B. KLAASSEN: "AC bias read-while-write driver" |