EP0111581 - Process for the preparation of 5-(2,6-dichloro-4-trifluoromethyl-phenoxy)-2-nitro-alpha-phenoxy-propionic acid-(hydroxyacetic acid ethyl ester) ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sehnem, Hans Peter Nüller Strasse 90 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1984/26] | Application number, filing date | 82111767.8 | 18.12.1982 | [1984/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111581 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C76/02, C07C79/46 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
C07C201/08 (EP);
C07C201/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/08, C07C205/38 (EP);
C07C201/12, C07C205/38 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 5-(2,6-Dichlor-4-trifluor-methyl-phenoxy)-2-nitro-alpha-phenoxy-propionsäure-(hydroxyessigsäureethylester)-ester | [1984/26] | English: | Process for the preparation of 5-(2,6-dichloro-4-trifluoromethyl-phenoxy)-2-nitro-alpha-phenoxy-propionic acid-(hydroxyacetic acid ethyl ester) ester | [1984/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'ester de l'hydroxyacétate d'éthyle avec l'acide 5-(2,6-dichloro-4-trifluorométhylphénoxy)2-nitro-alpha-phénoxypropionique | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1982 | Examination requested [1984/26] | 15.05.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0014900 |