EP0083787 - Toothbrush with an interchangeable brush head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1987 | Request for re-establishment of rights | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lang, Ludwig Rodinghweg 3 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Lang, Ortulf Götz Rodinghweg 3 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1983/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/29] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111980.7 | 23.12.1982 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | DE19823200681 | 13.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3200681 | DE19823238035 | 14.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3238035 | [1983/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0083787 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0083787 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A46B7/04, A46B7/02 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
A46B7/042 (EP);
A46B5/0062 (EP);
A46B5/007 (EP);
A46B5/0095 (EP);
A46B7/04 (EP);
A46B2200/1066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/40] |
Former [1983/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Zahnbürste mit einem auswechselbaren Bürstenkopf | [1983/29] | English: | Toothbrush with an interchangeable brush head | [1983/29] | French: | Brosse à dents munie d'une tête de brosse interchangeable | [1983/29] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 03.07.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 02.07.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/12] | 01.08.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/12] | 16.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE3129645 ; | [Y]US1337173 ; | [Y]US2053905 ; | [A]US2219753 ; | [A]US2175278 ; | [A]EP0016564 ; | [A]US1887913 |