EP0083115 - Laminate compositions with polyarylate and poly(aryl ether) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 19.04.1989 [1989/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive P.O. Box 5910-A Chicago Illinois 60680 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive P.O. Box 5910-A Chicago Illinois 60680 / US | ||
Former [1983/27] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robeson, Lloyd Mahlon R.D. 1, Box 244 Whitehouse Station Hunterdon New Jersey 08889 / US | 02 /
Lynn, John Wendell 209 Lynn Lane Westfield Union New Jersey 07090 / US | [1983/27] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82112102.7 | 29.12.1982 | [1983/27] | Priority number, date | US19810335452 | 29.12.1981 Original published format: US 335452 | [1983/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0083115 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0083115 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083115 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, F24J2/00, C08G63/18 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B29D11/0073 (EP);
B32B27/308 (US);
C08G63/19 (EP);
C08G63/6886 (EP);
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
B32B2307/712 (US);
B32B2457/00 (US);
C08J2467/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1984/24] | B32B27/08, F24J3/02, C08G63/18 | ||
Former IPC [1983/27] | B32B27/08, C08G63/18, C08G63/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/27] | Title | German: | Schichtstoffzusammensetzungen aus Polyarylat und Polyaryläther | [1983/27] | English: | Laminate compositions with polyarylate and poly(aryl ether) | [1983/27] | French: | Compositions pour laminé à base de polyarylate et de polyether d'aryle | [1983/27] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 13.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.1986 | SE | 31.10.1986 | [1989/16] |
Former [1989/08] | AT | 29.10.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3460961 (YOUNG RAYMOND H JR, et al); | [AD]US3503779 (YOUNG RAYMOND H JR, et al); | [AD]US4108837 (JOHNSON ROBERT N, et al) |